Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Jerusha T Adams
Case #: 2:25-cv-00316
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 4:55 PM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/30/2025. (TPS)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 4:53 PM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause, it is ORDERED that the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Doc. No. 3 ) filed by Attorney Matthew R. McGarry is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/30/2025. (TPS)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/30 11:56 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams. (AM)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 10:10 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number AALMDC-3852341.) by Christy Morgan. (McGarry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 10:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christy Morgan. (McGarry, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek, filed by Christy Morgan. (McGarry, Matthew) Modified on 4/30/2025 to remove Rule 4m deadline(AM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
service Notice: Social Security Case Service Wed 04/30 11:58 AM
Notice: Social Security Case Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 USC 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No Summons shall issue. Leland Dudek answer due 6/30/2025. (AM)
Related: [-]