Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Gary A Fenner
Case #: 4:25-cv-00305
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 11:10 AM CDT
Defendant
Aldi Inc.
James E. Godfrey, Jr. Evans & Dixon LLC 211 North Broadway
Saint Louis, MO 63102
Represented By
James E. Godfrey, Jr
Evans & Dixon-Stl
contact info
Plaintiff
Willie Dunson


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
13 13 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Fri 05/09 11:10 AM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher J Hinckley on behalf of Plaintiff Willie Dunson.(Hinckley, Christopher)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/09 1:03 AM
Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. Modified on 5/9/2025 to correct incomplete filing.(KRK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
notice Notice of Docket Modification Thu 05/08 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 5/7/2025 as Document No. 12, Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event - Disclosure of Corporate Interest (Civil - Other Filings - Discover Documents - Disclosure of Corporate Interest). This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
12 12 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Wed 05/07 3:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Christopher J Hinckley on behalf of Plaintiff Willie Dunson.(Hinckley, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 8:23 AM
ORDER granting10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Christopher J. Hinckley for Willie Dunson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 1:33 PM
Motion to allow Christopher J. Hinckley to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9566263) filed by James Matthew French on behalf of Willie Dunson. (French, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 order Rule 16 Notice Mon 05/05 11:07 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/19/2025. Rule 26 conference due by 6/9/2025. Signed on 5/5/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 11:04 AM
NOTICE of appearance by James Matthew French on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney James Matthew French added to party Willie Dunson(pty:pla))(French, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of MAPN Wed 04/30 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 11:20 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Kerry Banahan on behalf of Aldi Inc. (Attorney Kerry Banahan added to party Aldi Inc.(pty:dft))(Banahan, Kerry)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Wed 04/30 11:18 AM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James E. Godfrey, Jr on behalf of Defendant Aldi Inc..(Godfrey, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 11:13 AM
NOTICE of appearance by James E. Godfrey, Jr on behalf of Aldi Inc. (Godfrey, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/30 11:12 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Aldi Inc.(Godfrey, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court)
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/30 10:59 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Aldi Inc..(Godfrey, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/30 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2516-CV00548, Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9555989.(Godfrey, James) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened PDF version on 4/30/2025) (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Court File