Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00488
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 11:11 AM CDT
Defendant
Cumberland Hospitality Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Rockefeller Photos, LLC
Represented By
Neil M. McIntire
Howell & Fisher, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/05 12:37 PM
NOTICE by Rockefeller Photos, LLC Notice Regarding Complaint Exhibits (McIntire, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 2:02 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/1/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (sb)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 8:25 AM
Summons issued as to Cumberland Hospitality Group, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (sb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 12:15 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rockefeller Photos, LLC. (McIntire, Neil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Wed 04/30 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Cumberland Hospitality Group LLC d/b/a Scoreboard Nashville. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (McIntire, Neil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 04/30 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/8/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ch)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Wed 04/30 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ch)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 04/30 10:41 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 04/30 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 04/30 10:42 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Neil M. McIntire admitted to this court . (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Wed 04/30 10:43 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (ch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 10:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Cumberland Hospitality Group, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4312244), filed by Rockefeller Photos, LLC.(ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - A,
Att: 2 Exhibit - B,
Att: 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet