Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00485
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 04/30 10:17 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 04/30 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Wed 04/30 10:19 AM
Notice mailed to pro se parties regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Wed 04/30 10:20 AM
***For the record, it does not appear that Kayla Cunningham is an attorney.*** (mg) Modified on 4/30/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 9:48 AM
PROPOSED Summons by Kayla Ann Cunningahm. (Note: Plaintiff Cunningham did not offer the proper Summons, therefore, the correct Summons (blank) will be mailed to Cunningham to complete.) (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Leave Wed 04/30 9:39 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Electronically as a Pro Se Litigant by Kayla Ann Cunningahm. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Frankie Gray, John Robbie MacDonald (Filing fee $405, Receipt number 300005504), filed by Gary Lee Baker, Kayla Ann Cunningahm. (Note: It appears that Baker did not sign-off on any of the filings.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Supplement to Complaint,
Att: 2 Attachment - General and Medical Power of Attorney,
Att: 3 Attachment - Receipt,
Att: 4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet