Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:25-cv-21981
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:08 PM EDT
Defendant
MERION VILLAGE DENTAL - VESHA & JANIKIAN, L.L.C.
Plaintiff
JUSTO PORTILLO
Represented By
Christopher Chagas Gold
Gold Law, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/09 10:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JUSTO PORTILLO. MERION VILLAGE DENTAL - VESHA & JANIKIAN, L.L.C. waiver sent on 5/9/2025, response/answer due 7/8/2025. (Gold, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 3:48 PM
Summons Issued as to MERION VILLAGE DENTAL - VESHA & JANIKIAN, L.L.C.. (nan)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/30 3:46 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 12:27 PM
COMPLAINT against MERION VILLAGE DENTAL - VESHA & JANIKIAN, L.L.C.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18410795, filed by JUSTO PORTILLO.(Gold, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)