Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Case #: 1:25-cv-21980
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Burger King Company LLC.
Plaintiff
Olga Sanchez Marquez
Represented By
Roderick Victor Hannah
Roderick V. Hannah, Esq., P.A.
contact info
Pelayo M. Duran
Law Office Of Pelayo Duran, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 05/07 10:39 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Olga Sanchez Marquez. Burger King Company LLC. served on 5/1/2025, response/answer due 5/22/2025. (Duran, Pelayo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 notice Certificate of Counsel Tue 05/06 9:29 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order, re Prior ADA Filings by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Olga Sanchez Marquez (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 05/05 10:54 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 05/05 10:53 AM
ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT re1 Complaint filed by Olga Sanchez Marquez. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 12:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Burger King Company LLC.. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/30 12:39 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ellen F. D'Angelo is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Burger King Company LLC.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18410766, filed by Olga Sanchez Marquez.(Duran, Pelayo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)