New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Referred: Valerie Figueredo
Case #: 1:25-mc-00198
CauseM 77 Application to have subpoena issued to person living in this district re: action in foreign cou
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 4:08 AM EDT
In Re
Favariz Business Limited
Represented By
Michael James Dehart
Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/07 4:04 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Valerie Figueredo. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 5/7/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
utility Case Designation Tue 05/06 4:18 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 misc Proposed Order Mon 05/05 4:38 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Favariz Business Limited. Related Document Number:4 ..(Dehart, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Mon 05/05 3:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Timur Valiev in Support re:4 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Petition to take foreign discovery .. Document filed by Favariz Business Limited..(Dehart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Valiev Ex. 1 - 2013-10-09 Hamer - Final Award,
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit Valiev Ex. 2 - 2017 03 21 Deed of assignment Hamer-Favariz,
Att: 3 Exhibit Valiev Ex. 3 - 2017 03 23 Stay and Settlement Deed,
Att: 4 Exhibit Valiev Ex. 4 - 2023 07 25 Redao - Notice to TML,
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit Valiev Ex. 5 - Stay and Set Aside Applications
7 7 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Mon 05/05 3:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Michael J. Dehart in Support re:4 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Petition to take foreign discovery .. Document filed by Favariz Business Limited..(Dehart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena request,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Order
6 6 22 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 05/05 3:47 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:4 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Petition to take foreign discovery . . Document filed by Favariz Business Limited..(Dehart, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Order Mon 05/05 3:35 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Favariz Business Limited. Related Document Number:1 ..(Dehart, Michael) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 5/5/2025 (km)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Discovery Mon 05/05 3:21 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Petition to take foreign discovery . Document filed by Favariz Business Limited.(Dehart, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Mon 05/05 2:56 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Dehart, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Miscellaneous Pleading Mon 05/05 2:27 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT MISCELLANEOUS PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael James Dehart to RE-FILE Document No. 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Petition to take foreign discovery. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31008878). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): supporting documents must be filed as separate entries on the docket in support of your Motion for Discovery, not as attachments. Re-file the pleading using the event type Motion for Discovery found under the event list Miscellaneous Case Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers. (vba)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Mon 05/05 2:29 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael James Dehart. Attorney must electronically file the Miscellaneous Cover Sheet. Use the event type Miscellaneous Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 05/05 2:31 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 05/05 2:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael James Dehart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Favariz Business Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 05/05 2:37 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(vba)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Order Mon 05/05 4:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Michael Dehart to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the case number is missing. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Mon 05/05 4:49 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 9 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 5:17 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Favariz Business Limited..(Dehart, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs motion Discovery Wed 04/30 1:47 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Discovery Petition to take foreign discovery . (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31008878)Document filed by Favariz Business Limited.(Dehart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 22 pgs Supplement MOL in Support of 1782 Application,
Att: 4 10 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Timur Valiev,
Att: 5 144 pgs Exhibit Valiev Ex. 1 - 2013-10-09 Hamer - Final Award,
Att: 6 Exhibit Valiev Ex. 2 - 2017 03 21 Deed of assignment Hamer-Favariz,
Att: 7 Exhibit Valiev Ex. 3 - 2017 03 23 Stay and Settlement Deed,
Att: 8 Exhibit Valiev Ex. 4 - 2023 07 25 Redao - Notice to TML,
Att: 9 4 pgs Exhibit Valiev Ex. 5 - Stay and Set Aside Applications,
Att: 10 2 pgs Affidavit Michael Dehart Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 3