Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:25-cv-00640
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 12:12 PM CDT
Defendant
JANIECE LONGORIA
Defendant
KELCY WARREN
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM BOARD OF REGENTS
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
Defendant
STUART STEDMAN
Defendant
JAMES WEAVER
Defendant
ROBERTO RODRIGUEZ
Defendant
NOLAN PEREZ
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Defendant
HECTOR LUEVANO
Defendant
JODIE LEE JILES
Defendant
L. HENRY
Defendant
ADAN ZAVALA
Defendant
JAY HARTZELL
Defendant
ROBERT GAUNTT
Defendant
KEVIN ELTIFE
Defendant
CHRISTINA MELTON CRAIN
Defendant
GREG ABBOTT
Defendant
REYNALDO ADAME
Plaintiff
CITLALLI SOTO-FERATE
Represented By
Rebecca Ruth Webber
Webber Law
contact info
Plaintiff
ILIANA MEDRANO
Represented By
Rebecca Ruth Webber
Webber Law
contact info
Plaintiff
ARWYN HEILRAYNE
Represented By
Rebecca Ruth Webber
Webber Law
contact info
Plaintiff
MIA CISCO
Represented By
Rebecca Ruth Webber
Webber Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 2:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to CHRISTOPHER GODSHALL-BENNETT. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 2:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MARIA AFTAB KARI. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Attachment Wed 05/07 10:43 AM
ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Ruth Webber for Applicant Maria Aftab Kari ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20117380) by Mia Cisco, Arwyn Heilrayne, Iliana Medrano, Citlalli Soto-Ferate. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Wed 05/07 10:37 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Ruth Webber for Applicant Maria Aftab Kari (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20117380) A Proposed Order is required when a non-dispositive Motion is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the Other Documents/Other Filings menu/submenu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion. In the Docket Text, type "(Proposed Order)". (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/06 2:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citlalli Soto-Ferate, Iliana Medrano, Mia Cisco, Arwyn Heilrayne as to L. Henry. Waiver sent on 5/6/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/06 2:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citlalli Soto-Ferate, Iliana Medrano, Mia Cisco, Arwyn Heilrayne as to Adan Zavala. Waiver sent on 5/6/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 3:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citlalli Soto-Ferate, Iliana Medrano, Mia Cisco, Arwyn Heilrayne as to University of Texas at Austin. Waiver sent on 5/2/2025, answer due 7/1/2025. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 3:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citlalli Soto-Ferate, Iliana Medrano, Mia Cisco, Arwyn Heilrayne as to Jay Hartzell. Waiver sent on 5/2/2025, answer due 7/1/2025. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/02 3:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citlalli Soto-Ferate, Iliana Medrano, Mia Cisco, Arwyn Heilrayne as to Hector Luevano. Waiver sent on 5/2/2025, answer due 7/1/2025. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 4:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott, Raynaldo Adame, Christina Melton Crain, Kevin Eltife, Robert Gauntt, Jay Hartzell, L. Henry, Jodie Lee Jiles, Janiece Longoria, Hector Luevano, Roberto Rodriguez, Stuart Stedman, University of Texas at Austin, Kelcy Warren, James Weaver, Christopher Wray. (kp)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/30 3:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mia Cisco, Arwyn Heilrayne, Iliana Medrano, Citlalli Soto-Ferate. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 2:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Adan Zavala. Duplicate requests not issued; no summons requested for other defendants at this time. (kp)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Order Wed 04/30 12:41 PM
Proposed Order to2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Ruth Webber for Applicant Maria Aftab Kari ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20117380) by MIA CISCO, ARWYN HEILRAYNE, ILIANA MEDRANO, CITLALLI SOTO-FERATE. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/30 12:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MIA CISCO, ARWYN HEILRAYNE, ILIANA MEDRANO, CITLALLI SOTO-FERATE. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 12:23 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Ruth Webber for Applicant Christopher Godshall-Bennett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20117403) by on behalf of MIA CISCO, ARWYN HEILRAYNE, ILIANA MEDRANO, CITLALLI SOTO-FERATE.(Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 12:18 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Ruth Webber for Applicant Maria Aftab Kari ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20117380) by on behalf of MIA CISCO, ARWYN HEILRAYNE, ILIANA MEDRANO, CITLALLI SOTO-FERATE. (Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-20116924), filed by CITLALLI SOTO-FERATE, ILIANA MEDRANO, MIA CISCO, ARWYN HEILRAYNE.(Webber, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/30 2:39 PM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 04/30 2:39 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 04/30 2:40 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mia Cisco, Arwyn Heilrayne, Iliana Medrano, Citlalli Soto-Ferate. (kp)
Related: [-]