Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10585

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:25-ap-50651
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ares Holding, LLC
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324
Represented By
Ares Holding, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Don Beskrone
500 Delaware Avenue 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Benjamin W. Keenan
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 05/06 3:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Ares Holding, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Palacio, Ricardo)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 04/30 9:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50651 JKS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (Hollis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 04/30 8:54 AM
Adversary case 25-50651 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Don Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc. against Ares Holding, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/29/2025. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A