Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10585

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:25-ap-50660
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
BRCO Inc.
111-113 N. 3rd Avenue
Oakdale, CA 95361
Represented By
BRCO Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Don Beskrone
500 Delaware Avenue 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Benjamin W. Keenan
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 05/08 9:52 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant BRCO Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 04/30 11:51 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50660 JKS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (Hollis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 04/30 11:29 AM
Adversary case 25-50660 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Don Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc. against BRCO Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/29/2025. (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A