Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:25-cv-00466
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 2:18 PM EDT
Defendant
Fairfield County
210 East Main Street
Lancaster, OH 43130
Defendant
Fairfield County Commissioners
210 East Main Street Room 301
Lancaster, OH 43130
Defendant
Fairfield County Court of Common Pleas
224 East Main Street
Lancaster, OH 43130
Defendant
Fairfield County Sheriff
345 Lincoln Avenue
Lancaster, OH 43130
Plaintiff
Thomas Gordon
3135 Sun Valley Drive
Pickerton, OH 43147
Represented By
Michela Huth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 11:16 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard Rosenthal as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/9/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/09 8:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Fairfield County on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (Huth, Michela)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/09 8:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Fairfield County Sheriff on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (Huth, Michela)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/09 8:02 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Fairfield County Court of Common Pleas on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (Huth, Michela)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/09 8:01 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Fairfield County Commissioners on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (Huth, Michela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 10:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10500315) of Richard Rosenthal by Plaintiff Thomas Gordon. (Huth, Michela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 3:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Fairfield County Sheriff (kk2)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Fairfield County (kk2)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Fairfield County Commissioners (kk2)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 3:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Fairfield County Court of Common Pleas (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10486460), filed by Thomas Gordon. (Huth, Michela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Pl Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form Fairfield County Ct of Common Pleas,
Att: 3 Summons Form Fairfield Cnty Commissioners,
Att: 4 Summons Form Fairfield County,
Att: 5 Summons Form Fairfield County Sheriff