Oregon District Court
Judge:Ann L Aiken
Case #: 1:25-cv-00719
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 11:07 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Medford
Defendant
Department of Human Services
Defendant
Oregon Child Welfare Division
Petitioner
Clarence Carr
1446 Thomas Rd
Medford, OR 97501


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 order Order Wed 04/30 8:52 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 4/30/2025 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/30/2025.) (ck)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Wed 04/30 8:37 AM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 04/29/2025.) (rsm)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Wed 04/30 8:34 AM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Clarence Carr. (rsm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 04/30 8:28 AM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 23JU05151, 23JU05152, 23JU05153, 23JU04428 and 25CV13571 from Jackson County Circuit Court. Filed by Clarence Carr. (rsm) (rsm). (rsm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/30/2025) Attachment,
Att: 2 (4/30/2025) Attachment,
Att: 3 (4/30/2025) Attachment,
Att: 4 (4/30/2025) Attachment
Att: 5 (4/30/2025) Civil Cover Sheet