New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:25-cv-02406
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 3:04 PM EDT
Defendant
Outerknown, LLC
Plaintiff
Derrick Anderson
Represented By
Uri Horowitz
Horowitz Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/05 1:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference set for July 1, 2025 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/5/2025. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 3:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Outerknown, LLC. (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Wed 04/30 3:06 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT Derrick Anderson against Outerknown, LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-19003752 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Derrick Anderson. (Horowitz, Uri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/30 3:03 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/30 3:05 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]