Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Dustin M Howell
Case #: 1:25-cv-00644
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgemen
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 2:11 PM CDT
Defendant
Shaun P. Norton
William W. Sentell Akerman LLP 1300 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 2300
Houston, TX 77056
Plaintiff
Sport Clips, LLC
Deborah L. Taylor, Esq. 3730 Kirby Drive
Suite 1200, TX 77098


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Wed 05/07 1:53 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norton Business Group MN, LLC. (Sentell, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Wed 05/07 11:59 AM
NOTICE - Consent to Removal by Vanity Ventures, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (Sentell, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 7 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Tue 05/06 4:05 PM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f); due on 6/30/2025. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 8:49 AM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/01 8:48 AM
STANDING ORDER (dated 02 27-2025 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/30 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-20117891), filed by Norton Business Group - MN, LLC.(Sentell, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Supplement Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/01 8:47 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 05/01 8:47 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
Related: [-]