Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary Jo Heston
Case #: 3:25-bk-41005
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
BG Shop, LLC
21 Adonai Ct
Shelton, WA 98584-7853
Represented By
Jennifer L Neeleman
Neeleman Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
12 12 misc Federal Tax Documents - PDF viewable by court only Wed 05/07 4:53 PM
Federal Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 - PDF viewable by court only. Filed by Jennifer L Neeleman on behalf of BG Shop, LLC. (Neeleman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 ans Declaration Wed 05/07 12:27 PM
Declaration of Marlo Brown re Cash Flow Statement, Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations Related [+]... Filed by Jennifer L Neeleman of Neeleman Law Group, P.C. on behalf of BG Shop, LLC. (Neeleman, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Deficient Filing
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 misc Proof of Service Tue 05/06 10:39 AM
Proof of Service re Order Setting Status Conference and Claim Notice (notice sent on 5/6/25) . Filed by Jennifer L Neeleman on behalf of BG Shop, LLC. Related [+]. (Neeleman, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 4 Scheduling Order Status Hearing Subchapter V
Att: 1 Claim Notice
Saturday, May 03, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 05/03 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Related [+]. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 341 Meeting of Creditors Sent to BNC for Mailing
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 misc BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 05/02 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Deficient Filing
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 court 341 Notice Prepare Thu 05/01 12:10 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Sent to BNC for Mailing . (MEH)
Related: [-]
6 6 trustee US Trustee's Setting Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Business (BNC) Thu 05/01 11:01 AM
Meeting of Creditors Business Filed by Hilary Bramwell Mohr on behalf of United States Trustee. With 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/27/2025 at 09:00 AM via Telephonic Creditors Meeting Chapter 11. Complaint Deadline: 7/28/2025. (Mohr, Hilary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 trustee Appointment of Trustee by the United States Trustee Wed 04/30 4:26 PM
Appointment of Trustee Geoffrey Groshong by the United States Trustee Filed by Hilary Bramwell Mohr on behalf of United States Trustee. (Mohr, Hilary)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Scheduling Order Status Hearing Subchapter V Wed 04/30 4:18 PM
ORDER Setting Status Conference and Deadline to File Claims . Status hearing is scheduled for 6/26/2025 at 10:00 AM at Judge Heston's ZoomGov. Pre-Status Report due by 6/12/2025, Proof of Claims due by 6/23/2025. (MEH) Modified on 4/30/2025 to match entry to order (MEH)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Deficient Filing Wed 04/30 1:09 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing . (MEH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 1:06 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Hilary Bramwell Mohr on behalf of United States Trustee. (Mohr, Hilary)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 (OTC) Wed 04/30 10:43 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual. Schedule A/B due 05/15/2025. Schedule D due 05/15/2025. Schedule E/F due 05/15/2025. Schedule G due 05/15/2025. Schedule H due 05/15/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/15/2025. Summary of schedules due 05/15/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/15/2025. Ch 11 Small Business Plan Subchapter V due by 07/29/2025, Filed by Jennifer L Neeleman of Neeleman Law Group, P.C. on behalf of BG Shop, LLC (Neeleman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 04/30 10:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition( 25-41005 [misc,1032] (1738.00). Receipt number A28813226. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Creditors Uploaded Wed 04/30 11:02 AM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 8 creditor(s). (admin)
Related: [-]