Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:25-cv-21989
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
DROEZTRIANGLE LLC
Defendant
SUBWAY 1916, INC.
Plaintiff
Carlos Brito
Represented By
Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Garcia-Menocal P.L.
contact info
Ramon Julio Diego
Law Office Of Ramon J. Diego, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 05/02 3:00 PM
ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULING REPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (ksr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to DROEZTRIANGLE LLC, SUBWAY 1916, INC.. (ksr)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/30 3:42 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ksr)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against DROEZTRIANGLE LLC, SUBWAY 1916, INC.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18412096, filed by Carlos Brito.(Garcia-Menocal, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)