Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Gregory F Vantatenhove
Case #: 6:25-cv-00082
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 order Order Terminate Motions Thu 05/01 10:09 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs2 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/1/2025.(JCP)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 9:44 AM
MOTION for Bryan Konoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph Blackburn ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6087963)(Konoski, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 socsec Standing Procedures Governing Social Security Actions Wed 04/30 4:42 PM
GENERAL ORDER 22-15: STANDING PROCEDURES GOVERNING FILINGS, BRIEFING, AND RESOLUTION OF ACTIONS: 1. An action is commenced upon filing of the complaint. 2. Clerk to notify Commissioner of Social Security and the U.S. Attorney via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). 3. Answer to the complaint must be served within 60 days of notice of the action as outlined in (2) above. 4. FRCP 12 motions due within 60 days of notice of action as outlined in (2) above. 5. Action is presented for decision by parties briefs. (a) Plaintiffs Brief is due 30 days after the answer is filed OR within 30 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under paragraph (4) above. (b) Commissioners Brief due within 30 days after service of Plaintiffs Brief. (c) Plaintiff's Reply brief due within 14 days after service of Commissioners Brief. 6. Extensions of time, page limitations or permissions to file additional briefs may be granted for good cause shown. 7. Except as otherwise provided motion practice shall be governed by LR 7.1. 8. Clerk directed to file this General Order in all actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). 9. On December 1, 2022, this General Order shall supersede General Order 13-17. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves. CC: COR.(KJA)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 4:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ralph Blackburn(KJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT (No Process Necessary), filed by Ralph Blackburn.(KJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Conflict Check Wed 04/30 4:36 PM
Conflict Check run. (KJA)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Wed 04/30 4:44 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ralph Blackburn (KJA)
Related: [-]