Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Yvette Kane
Case #: 1:25-cv-00759
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:25-cv-02007
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:18 PM EDT
Defendant
Timothy Damon
Defendant
York County Regional Police Department
Defendant
York County Regional Police Board Of Commissioners
Petitioner
Daniel Miller
34957 Schuylkill County Prison SPECIAL MAIL-OPEN ONLY IN PRESENCE OF INMATE 230 Sanderson Street
Pottsville, PA 17901
Represented By
Charles Theodore Tucker, Jr.
The Cochran Firm
contact info
Larry A. Weisberg
Weisberg Cummings, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Thu 05/01 11:56 AM
Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/1/25. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 04/30 4:01 PM
Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:25-cv-02007 containing electronic documents.
Related: [-]
12 12 5 pgs order Order Transferring Case Wed 04/30 3:34 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE SHALL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE USDC FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 4/30/25.4/30/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Transfer Case Wed 04/30 10:08 AM
MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of Pennsylvania filed by DANIEL MILLER.Certificate of Service.(WEISBERG, LARRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 04/30 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LARRY A. WEISBERG on behalf of DANIEL MILLER with Certificate of Service(WEISBERG, LARRY)
Related: [-]
THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO USDC FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA. (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
***Civil Case Terminated. (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
misc Remark Wed 04/30 3:37 PM
THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO USDC FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA. (JL)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 04/30 3:38 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:24-cv-03239. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of plaintiffs'7 Motion to Transfer Case ("Pls.' Mot.") and plaintiffs'8 additional Response, GRANTING plaintiffs'7 Motion and TRANSFERRING this case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Given that not all defendants have yet been served in this district, the interest of efficiency supports transfer without further delay. Cf. Kirby v. Mercury Sav. & Loan Ass'n , 755 F. Supp. 445, 448 (D.D.C. 1990) ("The Court has authority to act sua sponte to transfer a case to another federal district court pursuant to 1404(a)."). The Eastern District is an appropriate forum given that all defendants reside there and a significant part of the conduct at issue (the alleged discriminatory employment practices) also occurred there. See Pls.' Mot. at 2. For these same reasons, venue there is also convenient for both parties and judicial efficiency. Any witnesses and records are likely to be in that district and the district has a greater interest in adjudicating disputes that occurred there. See id. ; Bourdon v. U.S. Dep't of Homeland Sec. , 235 F. Supp. 3d 298, 304 (D.D.C. 2017) (describing the factors for transfer under § 1404(a). Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 9, 2025. (lcbah4) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.] (Entered: 04/09/2025)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
8 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply re 3/18/2025 MINUTE Order, filed by DANIEL MILLER. (Tucker, Charles) Modified event on 4/8/2025 (mg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of plaintiff's7 Motion to Transfer Case, DIRECTING plaintiff to submit, by March 21, 2025, an updated version of that motion indicating defendants' position on the nondispositive motion, as required by D.D.C. LCvR 7(m); Standing Order6 paragraph 7(d). Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 18, 2025. (lcbah4) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
7 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by DANIEL MILLER. (Tucker, Charles) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
6 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 28, 2025. (lcbah4) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
5 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to TIMOTHY DAMON, YORK COUNTY REGIONAL POLICE DEPARTMENT, YORK COUNTY REGIONAL POLICE BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DANIEL MILLER.(Tucker, Charles) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
3 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by DANIEL MILLER filed by DANIEL MILLER.(Tucker, Charles) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 ERRATA Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c) by DANIEL MILLER. (Tucker, Charles) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
***Staff notes.....Forwarded to motions judge for non-compliance (zsl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. Blank/Incomplete/Missing civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms using the event Civil Cover Sheet. Missing/Incorrect summonses. Please locate the summons applicable to your case at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms and file using the event Request for Summons to issue. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format. SECOND NOTICE. Continued non-compliance will result in an Order to Show Cause and/or dismissal of case. (zsl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. Blank/Incomplete/Missing civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms using the event Civil Cover Sheet. Missing/Incorrect summonses. Please locate the summons applicable to your case at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms and file using the event Request for Summons to issue. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against TIMOTHY DAMON, THE YORK COUNTY REGIONAL POLICE BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, YORK COUNTY REGIONAL POLICE DEPARTMENT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11302905) filed by DANIEL MILLER.(Tucker, Charles) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/21/2025.] [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons