Washington Western District Court
Judge:Jamal N Whitehead
Case #: 2:25-cv-00799
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 2:11 PM PDT
Defendant
Marshall Ferguson
Defendant
King County Superior Court
Defendant
Kiese Wilburn
Plaintiff
Dieu Merci Lubiba
ADDRESS UNDER PROTECTED REQUEST
KIRKLAND, WA 98034


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 order Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Wed 04/30 5:04 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Lubiba's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. No.2 , is DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiff via ad hoc NEF at address listed at Dkt.1 -8, unable to notify via USPS due to undisclosed address; hard copy of Order available for pick-up at the Clerk's office window during business hours)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 04/30 2:05 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Application,2 Proposed Document(s),. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Submitted, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted, Improper/Missing Signature. See attached letter for more information and instructions.Corrected signature page must be filed by 5/14/2025. Filer has until 5/30/2025 to correct IFP application cc Plaintiff via email with list of forms with invalid signatures, Correct IFP Form, Case Coversheet, and Pro Se Guide for Filing in Federal Court, unable to notify via USPS due to undisclosed address. (HH)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 04/30 2:00 PM
PROPOSED Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Order to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff Dieu Merci Lubiba re1 Application, Noting Date: 4/30/2025 (HH) Modified event type to Motion and added noting date on 4/30/2025 (KRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dieu Merci Lubiba in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
1 1 misc Application Wed 04/30 1:52 PM
SEALED APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Dieu Merci Lubiba. (HH) Modified to administratively seal Application for IFP at Dkt.1 and Application for Court-Appointed Counsel at Dkt.1 -6 re protective request of address on 4/30/2025 (KRA). Modified on 4/30/2025 (KRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,
Att: 2 Proposed Complaint,
Att: 3 Filer's Cover Letter,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet 1,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet 2,
Att: 6 SEALED Application for Court-Appointed Counsel,
Att: 7 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appoint Counsel,
Att: 8 Email Transmittal
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Wed 04/30 2:29 PM
Noting Date Set re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Noting Date 4/30/2025. (KRA)
Related: [-]