Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 2:25-cv-04088
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Case in other court:Pettis County, Missouri Circuit Court, 25PT-CC00013
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:07 PM CDT
Defendant
American Economy Insurance Company
Represented By
Bruce A. Moothart
Seyferth Blumenthal & Harris LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nadejda Lazarescu
Represented By
Brandee B. Bower
Bower Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Stefan Lazarescu
Represented By
Brandee B. Bower
Bower Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/02 9:53 AM
Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (Grube, Cheyenne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 order Rule 16 Notice Thu 05/01 3:34 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/17/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2025 09:30 AM by Telephone Conference before District Judge Brian C Wimes. Signed on 5/1/25 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of MAPN Wed 04/30 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
2 2 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Wed 04/30 3:48 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Bruce A. Moothart on behalf of Defendant American Economy Insurance Company.(Moothart, Bruce)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/30 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pettis County, Missouri County, case number 25PT-CC00013, filed by Bruce A. Moothart. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9557166.(Moothart, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Melissa Miller,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet