New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:25-cv-03611
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983d Civil Rights (Death)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 6:06 PM EDT
All Plaintiffs
Alethea Singletary
Defendant
John Doe Officers New York City Police Department
Defendant
THE CITY OF NEW YORK


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 4:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/02 3:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alethea Singletary..(Klein, Alexander)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Participation in Section 1983 Plan Fri 05/02 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/02 3:06 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander Robert Klein to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summonses can only be issued to parties to the case, New York City Police Department is not a party to the case. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 4:08 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, New York City Police Department, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alethea Singletary. (Klein, Alexander) Modified on 5/2/2025 (sj)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/01 4:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Klein, Alexander)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 05/01 2:18 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 05/01 2:21 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 05/01 2:21 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 05/01 2:22 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexander Robert Klein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alethea Singletary, THE CITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 05/01 2:22 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Robert Klein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/01 2:22 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alexander Robert Klein to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 2:22 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander Robert Klein to Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/30 6:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, John Doe Officers of the City of New York City Police Department NYPD, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alethea Singletary..(Klein, Alexander)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 6:10 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe Officers New York City Police Department, THE CITY OF NEW YORK. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31011746)Document filed by Alethea Singletary..(Klein, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet