Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00490
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 05/08 9:11 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Sarah J. Stone admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Stone on behalf of Grady Perry (Stone, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 04/30 2:27 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 04/30 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 2:26 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pedro Ignacio-Hernandez. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 04/30 2:22 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Pedro Ignacio-Hernandez.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Cover Letter
misc Annotation - Docket Wed 04/30 2:33 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
Related: [-]