Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-00033
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Case in other court:Tennessee Eastern, 3:25-cv-00144
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:08 PM CDT
Defendant
Tennessee Department of Children's Services
Plaintiff
Savannah Leanna Kolstedt
2014 N Willow Ave Apt B4
Cookeville, TN 38501


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 04/30 3:19 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 04/30 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 04/30 3:10 PM
Case transferred in from the District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 3:25-cv-00144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/30 11:40 AM
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Transfer to Middle District of Tennessee. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's "Request to Transfer" [Doc. 9]. The Court ORDERS the Clerk to TRANSFER this action to the Middle District of Tennessee Northeastern Division and to close this Court's file. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 04/30/2025. (AFW)
Related: [-]
Case transferred to District of Middle District of Tennessee Northeastern Division. (AFW) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Wed 04/30 3:20 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Wed 04/30 11:45 AM
Case transferred to District of Middle District of Tennessee Northeastern Division. (AFW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tennessee Department of Children's Services., filed by Savannah Leanna Kolstedt. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
9 9 MOTION to Transfer to Middle District of Tennessee and Response to Show Cause by Savannah Leanna Kolstedt. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 Letter from Savannah Kolstedt (MKM) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 MOTION for Emergency Relief by Savannah Leanna Kolstedt. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not dismiss this action or transfer this action to the Middle District of Tennessee in the interest of justice. Plaintiff MUST respond by April 25, 2025 . A failure to respond will be grounds for the Court to dismiss this action. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 04/09/2025. (Copy of Order to Show Cause mailed to Savannah Leanna Kolstedt at 2014 N Willow Ave, Apt B4 Cookeville, TN 38501) (AFW) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Savannah Leanna Kolstedt. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. c/m Savannah Leanna Kolstedt, 2014 N Willow Ave, Apt B4, Cookeville, TN 38501. (MKM) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. c/m Savannah Leanna Kolstedt, 2014 N Willow Ave, Apt B4, Cookeville, TN 38501. (MKM) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Emergency Relief by Savannah Leanna Kolstedt. (MKM) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope
1 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Savannah Leanna Kolstedt. (MKM) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 4/30/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Envelope