California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher B Latham
Case #: 3:25-bk-01733
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025

Debtor
Telcentris Inc
741 Garden View Ct Ste 201
Encinitas, CA 92024-2472
Represented By
Telcentris Inc
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 order Show Cause (Order) Thu 05/01 4:12 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed; The court will look for a notice of appearance by counsel on the docket by May 28, 2025.Otherwise, it will promptly dismiss the case. with BNC Service . Related [+] signed on 5/1/2025. (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
5 5 notice Special Notice by UST (Request) (paperless entry) Thu 05/01 3:10 PM
Request for Special Notice. United States Trustees Office, 880 Front Street, Third Floor, Suite 3230, San Diego, CA 92101 filed by Haeji Hong on behalf of United States Trustee. (Hong, Haeji)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Wed 04/30 6:00 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by CL. Receipt Number 302335. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Wed 04/30 4:54 PM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Related [+] (Lam, C.)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
2 2 court Photo Identification for Persons Filing a Petition without Attorney (secured image)(BNC) Wed 04/30 4:47 PM
Photo identification requirement for persons filing a petition without attorney representation. ID checked, petition filed by debtor(s) COURT NOTE: The PDF document is a secured image. (Lam, C.)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (fee) internal Wed 04/30 4:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals, Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 1738.00. Schedules A/B-J due 5/14/2025. State. of Fin. Affairs due 5/14/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Statistical Info. due 5/14/2025.Statement of Monthly Income (122B) Due: 5/14/2025.Corporate Ownership Statement Due: 5/14/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/14/2025, Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/28/2025, Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2025, Filed by Telcentris Inc. (Lam, C.) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2025 (Lam, C.)
Related: [-]