New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:25-cv-03514
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 05/01 1:08 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Richard Farmer 349-250-1214 16-06 Hazen St. East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (kgo)
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 05/01 4:33 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Richard Farmer 349-250-1214 16-06 Hazen St. East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (kgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization Wed 04/30 2:51 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 5/30/2025. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 5/30/2025. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 5/30/2025. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/30/25) (bl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement ifp,
Att: 2 Supplement prisoner authorization,
Att: 3 Supplement complaint signature page
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Wed 04/30 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe. Document filed by Richard Farmer..(nb) Modified on 4/30/2025 (nb)
Related: [-]