New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:25-cv-03618
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
1A1 INC.
220 Front St.
New York, NY 10038
Defendant
Riza Berkan
Defendant
EXCLONE, INC.
220 Front St.
New York, NY 10038
Plaintiff
David McDonell
8530 Barrington Ct.
West Springfield, VA 22152
Represented By
Robert Powers
Mcclanahan Powers, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 11:46 AM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Robert Franklin Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31015247. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David McDonell..(Powers, Robert) Modified on 5/1/2025 (bc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Robert Powers,
Att: 2 Exhibit Virginia Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Exhibit EDVA Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 5 Proposed Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 05/01 11:22 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Powers. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 1A1 INC., EXCLONE, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 05/01 11:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Powers. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $200000000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $200,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 05/01 11:46 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 05/01 11:46 AM
Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 05/01 11:46 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 2:19 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 3 MOTION for Robert Franklin Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31015247. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia, not state bar;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/30 10:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Powers, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 10:39 PM
COMPLAINT against 1A1 INC., Riza Berkan, EXCLONE, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31012836)Document filed by David McDonell..(Powers, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A