New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:25-cv-03616
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Armonk Senior Case LLC
Plaintiff
Philamena Graphine
Represented By
Abdul Karim Hassan
Abdul K. Hassan Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 2:39 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Armonk Senior Case LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 10:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Armonk Senior Care LLC, re:5 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Philamena Graphine..(Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/01 10:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/01 10:11 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Armonk Senior Case LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Philamena Graphine. Related document:1 Complaint..(Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 10:51 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Armonk Senior Case LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 05/01 10:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Abdul Karim Hassan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/01 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Abdul Karim Hassan to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 05/01 10:43 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 05/01 10:44 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 05/01 10:44 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/30 9:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Armonk Senior Case LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Philamena Graphine..(Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/30 9:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 9:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Armonk Senior Case LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31012757)Document filed by Philamena Graphine..(Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]