Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jared M Strauss
Case #: 0:25-cv-60841
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Deltamus Cason
Defendant
City of Sunrise
Defendant
Maurice Lawrence
Defendant
Sunrise Police Department
Defendant
Sunrise Police Pension Plan Board
Defendant
Unnamed Officers 1-3
Defendant
Michael West
Plaintiff
Nihal Michael Gautam

GPO May 02 2025
or full details. (cer)ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by 5/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/2/2025. See attached document f

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Compel Discovery Tue 05/06 10:45 AM
ORDER denying7 Motion for Judicial Notice; denying8 Motion for Immediate Judicial Review; denying9 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/6/2025. See attached document for full details. (emd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 motion Compel Discovery Mon 05/05 10:53 AM
EMERGENCY Motion to Compel Discovery by Nihal Michael Gautam. (ar24)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 10:52 AM
EMERGENCY Motion for Immediate Juducial Review by Nihal Michael Gautam.(ar24)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sworn Declaration
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 10:50 AM
MOTION for Judicial Notice of Public Records Obstruction by Nihal Michael Gautam. (ar24)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 10:48 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nihal Michael Gautam. (ar24)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Mon 05/05 10:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Terrell Bush, Deltamus Cason, City of Sunrise, Florida, John Doe, Evan Huggard, Maurice Lawrence, Carlos Lopez, Michael West, filed by Nihal Michael Gautam.(ar24)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
4 4 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/02 11:27 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by 5/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (cer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 9:28 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nihal Michael Gautam. (ebz)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Wed 04/30 9:28 AM
Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. (ebz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 9:24 AM
FEDERAL RICO & CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Deltamus Cason, City of Sunrise, Maurice Lawrence, Sunrise Police Department, Sunrise Police Pension Plan Board, Unnamed Officers 1-3, Michael West. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Nihal Michael Gautam. ( (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)( No address provided by Plaintiff )(ebz) Modified text on 4/30/2025 (ebz).
Related: [-]