Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:25-cv-21982
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Terminated:May 02, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 4 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 05/05 3:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No.1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice under the three-strikes rule of § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, any scheduled hearings are CANCELED, all pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all deadlines are TERMINATED. DONE AND ORDERED in Chambers at Miami, Florida, on April 30, 2025. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/30/2025. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
2 2 order Judge Assignment Wed 04/30 12:41 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom (kma)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens Wed 04/30 12:35 PM
Emergency Civil Rights Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against C.I.A. Operative, Gary Hewitt. Filing fee $ 405.00 (not paid/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Levory Hickmon.(kma) (kma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/30/2025) Exhibit Conspiracy to Commit Murder