Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarah F Russell
Case #: 3:25-cv-00688
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Wed 04/30 4:06 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 04/30 4:05 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 4/28/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Wed 04/30 4:04 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 4/28/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order re: Filing Fee Wed 04/30 3:01 PM
ORDER: We received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus which has been assigned case number 3:25cv688 In order to proceed, the filing fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis must be submitted to the Court by 5/28/2025 or the case will be subject to dismissal. Fee information and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form may be found on the Court's website at ctd.uscourts.gov. Dismissal due by 5/28/2025. Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 04/30 2:57 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin McCarty. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
utility NEW Case Assignment Wed 04/30 4:02 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Sarah F. Russell assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]