Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:25-cv-00518
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:05 AM EDT
Defendant
INVNT Productions, LLC
Plaintiff
JKZ Group LLC
Represented By
Daniel A. O'Brien
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:12 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmf)
Related: [-]
service No Summons Issued Wed 05/07 10:34 AM
No Summons Issued. (slk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Wed 04/30 2:59 PM
ORDER granting D.I.1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/30/2025. (slk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 04/30 11:25 AM
Remark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge CFC. (slk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 04/30 3:01 PM
Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (slk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Wed 04/30 11:23 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by JKZ Group LLC. (slk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 04/30 11:22 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (slk)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 11:21 AM
[SEALED] COMPLAINT against INVNT Productions, LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4673855) - filed by JKZ Group LLC.(slk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 3 pgs motion Seal Wed 04/30 8:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by JKZ Group LLC.(slk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order