Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Tiffany R Johnson
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:25-cv-02368
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff
Syeda Harvey
Represented By
Jenna Dakroub
Consumer Justice Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/08 3:09 PM
Return of Service Executed by Syeda Harvey. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 5/6/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Wed 05/07 1:59 PM
Return of Service Executed by Syeda Harvey. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 5/2/2025, answer due 5/23/2025. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/30 9:33 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 9:31 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Syeda Harvey. (ajw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14256047) filed by Syeda Harvey.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet