Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Referred: Russell G Vineyard
Case #: 1:25-cv-02387
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
LVNV Funding LLC
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Defendant
Upgrade, Inc.
Plaintiff
Everett Clinton Scott
Represented By
Octavio Gomez
The Consumer Lawyers, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/05 11:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Everett Clinton Scott. Upgrade, Inc. waiver mailed on 5/2/2025, answer due 7/1/2025. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 11:53 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Everett Clinton Scott. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/30 3:31 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to LVNV Funding LLC. (cpp)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/30 3:31 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (cpp)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/30 3:30 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (cpp)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/30 3:30 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (cpp)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/30 3:30 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Upgrade, Inc.. (cpp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Everett Clinton Scott. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14259176)(cpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet