Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Referred: Christopher C Bly
Case #: 1:25-cv-02401
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Danielle Terrell
And All Other Occupants 599 Plainville Drive SW
Atlanta, GA 30331
Plaintiff
FYR SFR Borrower, LLC
PO Box 451027
Atlanta, GA 31145
Represented By
Randel Upton Self, Jr.
Self & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/02 9:21 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Danielle Terrell re3 Final Report and Recommendation,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 05/02 9:20 AM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 5/1/2025. (ane)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP Fri 05/02 9:18 AM
ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal. It is RECOMMENDED that this case be REMANDED to the State Court of Fulton County. For the purposes of remand only, Defendant's1 Application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 5/1/2025. (ane)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/02 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. filed by Danielle Terrell.(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 3:00 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danielle Terrell.(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/30 3:02 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (ane)
Related: [-]