Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:25-cv-00114
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Hamilton Health Care Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Nationwide Recovery Service, Inc.
Plaintiff
Martha Self
Represented By
Casondra Turner
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 04/30 2:55 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Hamilton Health Care Systems, Inc., Nationwide Recovery Service, Inc. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 2:53 PM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Martha Self. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14258958)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet