Maryland District Court
Judge:Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
Case #: 8:25-cv-01361
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Steven Michael Lee Sloan
21745 S. Coral Drive Unit 1560
Lexington Park, MD 20653
Plaintiff
Corryn M. Neal
2345 S. Hampton Drive
Bryans Road, MD 20616


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 notice Deficiency Notice-Non-Prisoner Wed 04/30 2:22 PM
Deficiency Notice for Steven Michael Lee Sloan re: (ECF No.3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Steven Michael Lee Sloan ); must be corrected by 5/14/2025 (c/m to P with IFP Form heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 04/30 9:59 AM
Removal Notification Letter from the Clerk to Prose Defendant. (c/m 4/30/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 04/30 9:58 AM
Removal Notification Letter from the Clerk to Prose Plaintiff. (c/m 4/30/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Wed 04/30 9:48 AM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 4/30/2025. (c/m to P and D on 4/30/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Wed 04/30 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Steven Michael Lee Sloan or counsel for Steven Michael Lee Sloan are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/14/2025. (c/m to D on 4/30/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Wed 04/30 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Corryn M. Neal or counsel for Corryn M. Neal are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/14/2025. (c/m to P on 4/30/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Wed 04/30 9:29 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 9:28 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Michael Lee Sloan.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 9:25 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Steven Michael Lee Sloan, filed by Corryn M. Neal.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/30 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Charles County, Maryland, case number C-08-FM 22-01023 , filed by Steven Michael Lee Sloan.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (heps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
Att: 3 (4/30/2025) Attachment
utility Remark - State Court Docs Wed 04/30 9:25 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CHARLES COUNTY, MARYLAND. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]