New Mexico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert H Jacobvitz
Case #: 1:25-bk-10518
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 28, 2025

Debtor
D'Angelico Enterprises, Inc., a New Mexico corporation
3209 Mercantile Ct Ste A
Santa Fe, NM 87507-2959
Represented By
Christopher M Gatton
Gatton & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Yvette J. Gonzales
Trustee PO Box 1037
Placitas, NM 87043
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
PO Box 608
Albuquerque, NM 87103


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 12:50 AM MDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
crditcrd none Wed 04/30 9:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-10518 7] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A5771252, amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Set Deficiency Deadlines Wed 04/30 1:29 PM
Set Deficiency Deadlines . Schedule A/B due 5/14/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/14/2025. Mailing List of creditors due 14 days before 5/14/2025. (noel)
Related: [-]
court Set Judge Code Flag Wed 04/30 1:34 PM
Set Judge Code Flag to JS (Jacobvitz-Santa Fe) . (noel)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE) Wed 04/30 9:31 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals and Signature page. Fee Amount $338 Filed by D'Angelico Enterprises, Inc., a New Mexico corporation. Schedule A/B due 5/14/2025. Schedule D due 05/14/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/14/2025, Schedule G due 05/14/2025. Schedule H due 05/14/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/14/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/14/2025. Due date for papers to be filed within 14 days of petition: 05/14/2025. (Gatton, Christopher)Modified on 4/30/2025 (noel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 04/30 9:41 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Debtor D'Angelico Enterprises, Inc., a New Mexico corporation. (Gatton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation Wed 04/30 9:58 AM
Disclosure of Compensation. Filed by Debtor D'Angelico Enterprises, Inc., a New Mexico corporation. (Gatton, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 04/30 2:01 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Yvette Gonzales with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 02:00 PM at Zoom - Gonzales: Meeting ID 659 019 1252, Passcode 0805172275, Phone 1-505-605-4528. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]