California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-13638
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 03, 2025

Debtor
Filservices, Inc.
1142 S Diamond Bar Blvd PMB 216
Diamond Bar, CA 91765-2203
Represented By
David H Chung
Maclean Chung Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Rosendo Gonzalez (TR)
Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. 530 S. Hewitt Street, Suite 148
Los Angeles, CA 90013
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:32 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/30 5:41 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Filservices, Inc. (Chung, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 04/30 7:07 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Gonzalez (TR), Rosendo with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/3/2025 at 11:00 AM via Zoom - Gonzalez: Meeting ID 987 345 9194, Passcode 5564413706, Phone 1 213 592 3540. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]