California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-13648
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 06, 2025

Debtor
World Mechanical Inc.
660 S Figueroa St Ste 1888
Los Angeles, CA 90017-3433
Represented By
David B Zolkin
Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Timothy Yoo (TR)
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Golubchik 2818 La Cienega Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90034
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:32 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/30 7:47 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:25-bk-13648] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58361672. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/30 7:44 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by World Mechanical Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 05/14/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 05/14/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 05/14/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 05/14/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 05/14/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 05/14/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 05/14/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 05/14/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/14/2025. (Zolkin, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 04/30 8:04 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Yoo (TR), Timothy with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/6/2025 at 11:00 AM via Zoom - Yoo: Meeting ID 870 697 9156, Passcode 7087440786, Phone 1 213 592 2606. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]