Arizona District Court
Judge:Scott H Rash
Case #: 4:25-cv-00201
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:15 AM MST
Defendant
Nalco Company LLC
Represented By
W Bryan Farney
Farney PC
contact info
Caryn Cross
Farney PC
contact info
Cassandra Klingman
Farney PC
contact info
Kathryn Emma Bettini
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Tucson Electric Power Company
Represented By
Michael P Harnden
Farhang & Medcoff PLLC
contact info
Alexandra V Tracy-Ramirez
Farhang & Medcoff PLLC
contact info
Adam Thomas Peterson
Farhang & Medcoff PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 05/09 2:34 PM
Disclosure Statement by Tucson Electric Power Company identifying Corporate Parent UNS Energy Corporation for Tucson Electric Power Company. (Peterson, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
7 7 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 05/06 1:27 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting a telephonic Scheduling Conference for Tuesday, June 10, 2025 at 10:00 AM, before the law clerk to the Honorable Scott H. Rash. (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 05/06/2025. (VSB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/05 5:35 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Nalco Company LLC.(Bettini, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 05/02 1:38 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for William Bryan Farney, Cassandra L Klingman, Caryn L Cross on behalf of Defendant Nalco Company LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 misc Notice of Errata Thu 05/01 10:54 PM
NOTICE of Errata re:4 Disclosure Statement, by Defendant Nalco Company LLC..(Bettini, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 4:20 PM
Disclosure Statement by Nalco Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nalco Holding Company LLC, Corporate Parent Ecolab Inc. for Nalco Company LLC.(Bettini, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Attachment to Corporate and Diversity Disclosure Statement of Defendant Nalco Company LLC
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 2:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to All Parties. (VSB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
2 2 misc New Case Opened Wed 04/30 2:34 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24239791. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-00201 TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (VSB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 04/30 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20251679. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24239791 filed by Nalco Company LLC. (Bettini, Kathryn)(VSB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
service Service Executed Wed 04/30 2:32 PM
*** STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nalco Company LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon The Corporation Trust Company on 04/02/2025. (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 04/14/2025) (VSB)
Related: [-]