New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-10112
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN (1)
Represented By
K. ANTHONY THOMAS
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
DESIREE LEIGH GRACE
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 6:43 AM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
Arrest (Rule 5) of JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN (jqb, )
Related: [-]
NOTICE as to JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN - Please be advised that an initial appearance was held in the above-captioned case pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. You can obtain the original record by accessing CM/ECF through PACER. (Eastern District of Tennessee 25-cr-53) (jqb, )
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT Received as to JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN (jqb, )
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN held on 4/28/2025. Bail Set. Government's 24 hour stay granted. Court's ruling stayed for 24 hours. (ECR) (jqb, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/29/2025) (jqb, ).
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN - K. ANTHONY THOMAS for JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/28/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/28/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN (1) $100,000 Unsecured Appearance Bond, PTS supervision, travel restricted, surrender passport, mental health testing/treatment, etc. The defendant shall remain detained pending approval of an appropriate address by Pretrial Services. Court's ruling stayed for 24 hours until 5:00 p.m. on April 29, 2025. Defendant shall not be removed until vetting of a residence in the Continental U.S. has been accommodated. (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/28/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Unsecured Appearance Bond Entered as to JAKEEM JUMAR MARTIN in amount of $100,000. (jqb, )
Related: [-]