Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00287
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez (1)
Represented By
Fabian Limas, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
William F. Hagen
Assistant Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 3:44 AM CDT
Sunday, April 06, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez (1), filed. (bav1) (jmt1). [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez; date of arrest: 4/5/2025, filed. (bav1) (jmt1). (jmt1). [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/7/2025) Unredacted attachment
Monday, April 07, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 4/7/2025 as to Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendant examined by the U.S. Probation Office. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. Based on the review of defendant's Financial Affidavit, the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appointment of counsel. Preliminary Examination set for 04/16/2025 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III. Bond set $25,000 cash with the following conditions: Defendant shall first execute an immigration bond and secondly provide sufficient verifiable information demonstrating significant ties to the community. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, the Government is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. Appearances: AUSA: J Esquivel, USPO: J Pina, DUSM: R Ramirez, ERO: D Noriega, Interpreter: M Hanson ( mcg, 1) (09:38-10:25am) [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. William F. Hagen appearing for USA, filed. (Hagen, William) [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez. Fabian Limas appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (mcg1) [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (mcg1) [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez, filed. [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
6 6 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez, filed. (Limas, Fabian) [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez, filed. (nac1) [1:25-mj-00261]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (sac1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez, filed. (sac1)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Jose Antonio Munoz-Martinez. Arraignment set for 5/8/2025 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III, filed. (sac1)
Related: [-]