Utah District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00454
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:47 AM MDT
Defendant
Russell Allen (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Samuel S. Pead
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 4:57 AM MDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Russell Allen (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. (alf) Modified on 4/29/2025 to correct filing date (alf).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Russell Allen. (Pead, Samuel)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING HEARING OR TRIAL as to Russell Allen. Initial Appearance set for 5/1/2025 at 01:15 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/29/2025.(lam)
Related: [-]