California Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean C Riordan
Case #: 2:25-cv-01223
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 05/09 8:38 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Wed 04/30 10:20 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/28/2025*. Consent or Decline due by 6/2/2025. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Litigant Letter,
Att: 2 E-Filing Notice
service Service by Mail Wed 04/30 10:22 AM
SERVICE BY EMAIL:2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Chauncey Dion Martin. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Wed 04/30 10:19 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Brinton by Chauncey Dion Martin. (Deputy Clerk JAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet