California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:25-cv-01918
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 8:02 PM PDT
Defendant
The Secretary of the Treasury
Defendant
United States
Represented By
Halsey Diakow
Doj-Tax
contact info
Plaintiff
Cathy J. Fitzpatrick
295 29th St Unit 711
Oakland, CA 94611


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 04/30 11:28 AM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 7 Stipulation to Stay Case. Status Report due by 6/30/2025 and every 60 days thereafter until any stipulation of dismissal is filed. (mkl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
10 10 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/30 7:47 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
8 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States.. (Diakow, Halsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Case and Case Deadlines filed by United States.(Diakow, Halsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy J. Fitzpatrick. All Defendants. Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint(Fitzpatrick, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit POS-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit POS-2
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
5 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cathy J. Fitzpatrick Certification of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons (Fitzpatrick, Cathy)
Related: [-]
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cathy J. Fitzpatrick.. (Fitzpatrick, Cathy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
3 3 Summons Issued as to The Secretary of the Treasury, United States, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against The United States and the Secretary of the Treasury (Filing fee $ 405-411018410) Filed by Cathy J. Fitzpatrick. Consent/Declination due by 3/10/2025.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 receipt