California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:25-cv-03528
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Shavon Butler
Plaintiff
Oak Tree Property Group
Represented By
Mark B. Chernev
Zacks & Freedman, PC
contact info
Lisa Karen Padilla
Zacks, Freedman & Patterson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/30 10:01 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Wed 04/30 7:31 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/30/2025. (ec, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 04/30 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shavon Butler (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byShavon Butler. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 6 MOTION to Remand
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 Ex Parte Application re6 MOTION to Remand on Shortened Time filed by Oak Tree Property Group.(Chernev, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Shortening Time,
Att: 6 Certificate/Proof of Service
6 6 MOTION to Remand filed by Oak Tree Property Group. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 5/8/2025. Replies due by 5/15/2025.(Chernev, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement MPA in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Mark Chernev in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 25-cv-3344-SI. Signed by Judge Kandis A Westmore on 4/23/2025. (ccf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shavon Butler. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shavon Butler. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Alameda (Hayward). Their case number is 25-112467. (). Filed by Shavon Butler. Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2025.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet