Oregon District Court
Judge:Adrienne Nelson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00725
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
The United States of America
Plaintiff
James Lathrop
Represented By
Melissa Lee Hopkins
The Law Offices Of Judy Snyder
contact info
Holly M. Lloyd
Law Offices Of Judy Snyder
contact info
Judy Danelle Snyder
Law Offices Of Judy Snyder
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 8:52 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rks)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 05/01 8:46 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Adrienne Nelson and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/29/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/29/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 9/29/2025. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (rks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 service Proposed Summons Wed 04/30 5:19 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by James Lathrop. (Snyder, Judy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 5:17 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9833399 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by James Lathrop against The United States of America. (Snyder, Judy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet