Original Case: 1:22-cv-06121

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01731
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 7:12 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
MUTUAL OF OMAHA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Daniel Keenan Ryan
HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARIO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By
Mario Rodriguez
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 3:19 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Mario Rodriguez by 05/05/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 05/13/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/09/2025 for Mario Rodriguez. [1] [7449528] 25-1731 (AP) [Entered: 04/30/2025 09:57 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 46 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court