Original Case: 1:19-cv-02170

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01733
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit315 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 7:12 AM CDT
Appellee
CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES
Represented By
Robert A. Clifford
CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES, P.C.
contact info
Appellee
COTCHETT, PITRE & MCCARTHY, LLP
Represented By
Robert A. Clifford
CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
BOEING COMPANY
Represented By
Dan K. Webb
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSHUA M. BABU, Individually and as Co-Personal Representatives of the Estate of JARED BABU MWAZO, deceased
Represented By
Eric C. Onyango
PRIME LEGAL, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EMILY C. BABU, Individually and as Co-Personal Representatives of the Estate of JARED BABU MWAZO, deceased
Represented By
Eric C. Onyango
PRIME LEGAL, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 5:48 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 05/13/2025. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Emily C. Babu and Joshua M. Babu by 05/05/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/09/2025 for Emily C. Babu and Joshua M. Babu. [1] [7449707] 25-1733 (AD) [Entered: 04/30/2025 04:20 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 351 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 2 pgs Notice to District Court