Original Case: 4:25-cv-00075

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-05062
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 2:20 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE KUNZWEILER, in his official capacity as District Attorney for the Fourteenth Prosecutorial District of Oklahoma
Represented By
Patrick R. Pearce Jr.
Ryan Whaley
contact info
Phillip G. Whaley
Ryan Whaley
contact info
Trevor Scott Pemberton
Office of the Governor of Oklahoma
contact info
Grant M. Lucky
Lytle Soule & Felty
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
VIC REGALADO, in his official capacity as Tulsa County Sheriff
Represented By
Johnathan L. Rogers
Hall Estill
contact info
Keith A. Wilkes
Hall Estill
contact info
Movant - Appellant
JIMMY GLENN HENDRIX
Represented By
Jimmy Glenn Hendrix
James Crabtree Correctional Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MUSCOGEE (CREEK) NATION, a federally recognized Indian tribe
Represented By
David Angelo Giampetroni
Kanji & Katzen
contact info
Olin Joseph Williams
Pitchlynn & Williams, PLLC
contact info
Riyaz A. Kanji
Kanji & Katzen
contact info
Stephanie Rush
Kanji & Katzen
contact info
Geri Wisner
Muscogee (Creek) Nation Attorney General
contact info
Philip H. Tinker
Kanji & Katzen, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 2:20 AM MDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
[11177780] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/29/2025 Notice of appearance and Fee or 1915 forms due in district court on 05/29/2025 for Jimmy Glenn Hendrix. Notice of appearance due on 05/13/2025 for Steve Kunzweiler, Vic Regalado, and Muscogee (Creek) Nation 25-5062
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Prelim ROA
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil/Habeas
[11177886] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These appeals arise from the same proceeding in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma. Movants-Appellants filed separate notices of appeal, resulting in Appeal Nos. 25-5062 and 25-5064 These appeals are hereby procedurally consolidated for preperation of the record on appeal, briefing, and submission to a panel of judges. See attached order. Served on 04/29/2025. 25-5062 25-5064
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Order
Att: 2 2 pgs Order Cover Letter